Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/02/2021 at 17:02:47 (UTC).

CARGLASS INC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CARGLASS INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2338

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARGLASS INC

GEORGE THOMPSON

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/24/2021 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 4/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSTIIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 05/24/2021 AT 0200PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARGLASS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Direct Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant