Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 18:49:29 (UTC).

CARGLASS INC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 CARGLASS INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0326

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARGLASS INC

4409 Hoffner Avenue, Suite 194

Orlando, FL 32812

PAUL CAPPOLA

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Fdfs - Service Of Process Section, P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INS CO

Fdfs - Service Of Process Section, P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Fdfs - Service Of Process Section, P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

Defendant Attorney

NATAIJA BROWN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 6/11/2020 AT 10:00 AM CTRM B

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 6/11/2020 AT 10:00 AM CTRM B

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS OBO PLTF

04/27/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS OBO PLTF

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

03/31/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 5/4/20 @ 10 AM CTRM B

03/17/2020: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 5/4/20 @ 10 AM CTRM B

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME & ADDRESS & CONTACT INFORMATION & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS JOINT CO COUNSEL FOR PLTF -BRUCE KAUFFMAN

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME & ADDRESS & CONTACT INFORMATION & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS JOINT CO COUNSEL FOR PLTF -BRUCE KAUFFMAN

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -BRUCE KAUFFMAN OBO PLTF (6/1/20 - 6/30/20)

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -BRUCE KAUFFMAN OBO PLTF (6/1/20 - 6/30/20)

MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY & COMPEL APPRAISAL BY DEFT

02/23/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY & COMPEL APPRAISAL BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTF`S 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

02/23/2020: OBJECTION TO PLTF`S 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 3/17/20 2:30PM & JURY TRIAL DATE - JS 4/20/20 9AM - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/24/20

02/24/2020: ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 3/17/20 2:30PM & JURY TRIAL DATE - JS 4/20/20 9AM - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/24/20

MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL BY DEFT

02/25/2020: MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS BY PLTF

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/24/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/24/2020: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 6/11/2020 AT 10:00 AM CTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL HEARING 5/4/20 @10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY & COMPEL APPRAISAL IN RESPONSE TO AMND COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -BRUCE KAUFFMAN OBO PLTF (6/1/20 - 6/30/20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME & ADDRESS & CONTACT INFORMATION & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS JOINT CO COUNSEL FOR PLTF -BRUCE KAUFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -BRUCE KAUFFMAN OBO PLTF (6/1/20 - 6/30/20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME & ADDRESS & CONTACT INFORMATION & NOTICE OF APPERANCE AS JOINT CO COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 05/04/2020 AT 1000AM

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 2/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] SET FOR 02/24/2020 AT 1000AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARGLASS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant