This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/15/2023 at 00:00:41 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA -VS- ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRA L KRAUSE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0434

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEBRA L KRAUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

01/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/25/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

01/25/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

01/25/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/25/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/07/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER

03/07/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

03/30/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

03/28/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/16/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] ON 05/16/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/07/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ELIZABETH L TAUSCHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] on 03/07/2023 at 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less