This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/27/2022 at 19:37:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA -VS- KYLE HOMENICK

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KYLE HOMENICK. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7020

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

KYLE HOMENICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2021-11-05 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/05/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

11/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/05/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/05/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

11/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - KYLE HOMENICK

11/27/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - KYLE HOMENICK

OPEN COURT MINUTES

12/14/2021: OPEN COURT MINUTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 12/14/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - KYLE HOMENICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 12/14/2021 at 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin