Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 19:43:23 (UTC).

CALIBRE CREST FEE OWNER LLC -VS- JOAN DRONE

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 CALIBRE CREST FEE OWNER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOAN DRONE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0718

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIBRE CREST FEE OWNER LLC

THE CREST AT ALTAMONTE

Defendants

STEVEN DRONE

JOAN DRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED UNSERVED OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ON PLTF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT & ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT & ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOAN DRONE & STEVEN DRONE 3/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - STEVEN DRONE ON 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - JOAN DRONE ON 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D STEVEN DRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JOAN DRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CREST AT ALTAMONTE is a litigant