Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 16:25:27 (UTC).

BRANTLEY TERRACE CONDO ASSN -VS- SHAWNDA L HOWARD

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 BRANTLEY TERRACE CONDO ASSN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHAWNDA L HOWARD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0531

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANTLEY TERRACE CONDO ASSN

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

SHAWNDA L HOWARD

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

ADVANTAGE ASSETS II INC

1200 S Pine Island Road, Ra C T Corporation System

Plantation, FL 33324

ERIC REDFORD

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANDACE SOLIS

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS FCL & RELEASE LIEN BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

07/13/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS FCL & RELEASE LIEN BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

RESPONSE TO DEFTS ANSWER BY PLTF

07/06/2020: RESPONSE TO DEFTS ANSWER BY PLTF

ANSWER BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

06/23/2020: ANSWER BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 6/4/20

06/04/2020: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 6/4/20

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY AS TO DEFTS UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 & UNKNOWN TENANT #2 BY PLTF

06/03/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY AS TO DEFTS UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 & UNKNOWN TENANT #2 BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

03/30/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

03/12/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

03/12/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD N/K/A ERIC REDFORD 3/10/20

03/12/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD N/K/A ERIC REDFORD 3/10/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/12/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

02/12/2020: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020016952

02/12/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020016952

SUMMONS ISSUED SHAWNDA L HOWARD

02/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED SHAWNDA L HOWARD

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD

02/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

02/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

02/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FCL & RELEASE LIEN BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFTS ANSWER BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT SHAWNDA L HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 6/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY AS TO DEFTS UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 & UNKNOWN TENANT #2 BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD N/K/A ERIC REDFORD 3/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ADVANGE ASSETS II INC 3/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ADVANTAGE ASSETS II INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAWNDA L HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SHAWNDA L HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020016952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advantage Assets II, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Solis, Candace C