This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 12/05/2022 at 22:44:40 (UTC).

BEVERLY GENETTI -VS- ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2021 BEVERLY GENETTI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1922

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY GENETTI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

SANFORD AIRPORT AUTHORITY

AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC

WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

DESIGNERS WEST INTERIORS INC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARLON WHITE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ALEX BRAUNSTEIN

DAVID GORDON

CHRISTOPHER HALL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFT WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

11/22/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFT WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (8)

10/25/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (8)

REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF

10/25/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF

LETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL RE PROPOSED ORDER

10/25/2022: LETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL RE PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTY AGOSTINO A ZAMMIELLOS VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/25/22

10/25/2022: ORDER GRANTING ATTY AGOSTINO A ZAMMIELLOS VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/25/22

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFTS ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC & SANFOR AIRPORT AUTHORITY

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFTS ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC & SANFOR AIRPORT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFOR INTERNATIONAL INC

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFOR INTERNATIONAL INC

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

10/21/2022: MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

08/01/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC

08/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - SANFORD AIRPORT AUTHORITY

08/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - SANFORD AIRPORT AUTHORITY

SUMMONS ISSUED - WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

08/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

08/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

08/01/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/01/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC BY PLTF

08/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC BY PLTF

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFT WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING ATTY AGOSTINO A ZAMMIELLOS VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/25/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL RE PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (8)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT ORLANDO SANFOR INTERNATIONAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFTS ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC & SANFOR AIRPORT AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFT DESIGNERS WEST INTERIORS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WALBRIDGE ALDINGER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SANFORD AIRPORT AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - AIRPORTS WORLDWIDE US HOLDINGS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORLANDO SANFORD INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DESIGNERS EST INTERIORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SANFORD AIRPORT AUTHORITY is a litigant