This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County on 12/05/2021 at 13:05:10 (UTC).

BERNARD J FALCO JR -VS- OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 BERNARD J FALCO JR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA L. MCINTOSH and CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0794

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DONNA L. MCINTOSH

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELISSA D FALCO

BERNARD J FALCO JR

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANDACE CULZAC

Defendant Attorneys

HOPE ZELINGER

GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ

CAROLINE PORTUONDO

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

11/24/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

CONSENT TO STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

11/24/2021: CONSENT TO STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

PRIVILEGE LOG & CLAIM FILE LOG BY DEFT

11/22/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG & CLAIM FILE LOG BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION 1ST BY DEFT

11/22/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION 1ST BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST BY DEFT

11/22/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO PLTFS BY DEFT

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO PLTFS BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS BY DEFT

11/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY HOPE C ZELINGER ESQ OBO DEFT

11/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY HOPE C ZELINGER ESQ OBO DEFT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 10/17/21

10/18/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 10/17/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED - OLYMPUS INS CO

03/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - OLYMPUS INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

04/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

04/20/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

03/23/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

03/23/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

03/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO PLTFS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION 1ST BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG & CLAIM FILE LOG BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY HOPE C ZELINGER ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 10/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE SPRYSENSKI REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY STONE GLASS & CONNOLLY LLP OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY GABRIELA RODRIGUEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - OLYMPUS INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ, GABRIELA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline Portuondo, Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zelinger, Hope C, ESQ.