This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 03:05:11 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0940

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

JOSEPH BRUNO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

ALEJANDRO MAGANA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS - BY DEFT

05/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS - BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY DEFT

05/18/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY DEFT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

05/12/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

05/12/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

04/26/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

04/27/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DFET

03/23/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DFET

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

03/23/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/28/23

02/28/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/28/23

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-24 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTFS - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DFET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - BY ALEJANDRO MAGANA ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/28/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 04/05/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less