This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 23:03:56 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

MAGDONY JUSINO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

KADIE FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

03/14/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

02/10/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

02/10/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

02/10/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PROCUTION FROM NON-PARTY BY DEFT

02/13/2023: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PROCUTION FROM NON-PARTY BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/03/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/03/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

01/03/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/03/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/03/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/03/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

01/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 1/3/23

01/03/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 1/3/23

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

01/26/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

01/26/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED - JUDGE KADIE FRANCIS ESQ OBO DEFT

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED - JUDGE KADIE FRANCIS ESQ OBO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

01/27/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PROCUTION FROM NON-PARTY BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED - JUDGE KADIE FRANCIS ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KADIE FRANCIS ESQ OBO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 1/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING 02/13/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less