This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 12/05/2022 at 04:57:27 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3903

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

KIMBERLY EBERHART

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

MARY GANTERT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DEPSOITION

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DEPSOITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2022-09-27 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/3/22

10/03/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/3/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

10/03/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

11/07/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY MARY GANTERT ESQ OBO DEFT

11/04/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY MARY GANTERT ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 10/12/22

11/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 10/12/22

OPEN COURT MINUTES

11/16/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

ORDER / NOTICE OF HEARING 12/15/22 @ 1:45PM - JUDGE SCHOTT 11/15/22

11/15/2022: ORDER / NOTICE OF HEARING 12/15/22 @ 1:45PM - JUDGE SCHOTT 11/15/22

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY/ORDER VACATING CASE MGNT ORDER/ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE COURT FILE SUBJECT TO REOPENING AFTER STAY IS LIFTED -JUDGE SCHOTT 11/21/22

11/21/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY/ORDER VACATING CASE MGNT ORDER/ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE COURT FILE SUBJECT TO REOPENING AFTER STAY IS LIFTED -JUDGE SCHOTT 11/21/22

MOTION TO STAY BY PLTF

11/21/2022: MOTION TO STAY BY PLTF

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY/ORDER VACATING CASE MGNT ORDER/ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE COURT FILE SUBJECT TO REOPENING AFTER STAY IS LIFTED -JUDGE SCHOTT 11/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 11/16/2022 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER / NOTICE OF HEARING 12/15/22 @ 1:45PM - JUDGE SCHOTT 11/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY MARY GANTERT ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 10/12/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/3/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPSOITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 11/16/2022 AT 1000AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bang Autoglass Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY GANTERT