This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/29/2023 at 23:09:37 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0974

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

RUBEN EMMANUEL

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

RYAN STRATTON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-27 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/27/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 3/1/23

03/01/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 3/1/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

03/01/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCES INS CO 3/9/23

03/10/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCES INS CO 3/9/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFTS -RYAN STRATTON ESQ

03/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFTS -RYAN STRATTON ESQ

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - BY PLTF

04/12/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

04/05/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY - BY DEFT

04/19/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY - BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

04/19/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

04/27/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/05/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFTS -RYAN STRATTON ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCES INS CO 3/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 3/1/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 04/05/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less