This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 14:33:02 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4588

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

RICHARD LOWE

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY,

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER TROYER

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/16/22

11/16/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/16/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

11/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/15/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 11/29/22

12/02/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 11/29/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION CHRISTOPHER TROYER ESQ OBO DEFTS

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION CHRISTOPHER TROYER ESQ OBO DEFTS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

12/28/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

01/05/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

01/05/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

01/04/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

OPEN COURT MINUTES

01/09/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 01/09/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION CHRISTOPHER TROYER ESQ OBO DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 11/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/16/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 01/09/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bang Autoglass Llc is a litigant