This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 21:47:54 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3896

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

SWINFORD SPEID

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

JONATHON STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

09/27/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

09/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO 10/10/22

10/10/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO 10/10/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -JONATHON STEPHENS ESQ

10/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -JONATHON STEPHENS ESQ

OPEN COURT MINUTES

10/31/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

MOTION TO DISMISS SUIT AS DUPLICATIVE BY DEFT

10/26/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS SUIT AS DUPLICATIVE BY DEFT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 10/31/2022 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS SUIT AS DUPLICATIVE BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -JONATHON STEPHENS ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO 10/10/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 10/31/2022 AT 1000AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bang Autoglass Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHON STEPHENS