This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 20:09:12 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0594

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

YUNIEL GONZALEZ

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

JONATHON STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-02 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/02/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

02/03/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY CO 2/13/23

02/17/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY CO 2/13/23

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/04/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

03/03/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/28/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/28/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JONATHON WESLEY STEPHENS ESQ OBO DEFT

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JONATHON WESLEY STEPHENS ESQ OBO DEFT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JONATHON WESLEY STEPHENS ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY CO 2/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less