This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 04:05:28 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0592

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

BIANCA MUNIZ

Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM SHAW

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

05/11/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY & NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE A SUBPOENA - BY DEFT

04/20/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY & NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE A SUBPOENA - BY DEFT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

04/11/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) - BY PLTF

04/11/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) - BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - BY PLTF

04/11/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE BAD FAITH ALLEGATIONS BY DEFT

04/06/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE BAD FAITH ALLEGATIONS BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

04/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY WILLIAM AUSTIN SHAW ESQ OBO DEFT

03/31/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY WILLIAM AUSTIN SHAW ESQ OBO DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/02/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

02/02/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY & NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE A SUBPOENA - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE BAD FAITH ALLEGATIONS BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM & ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY WILLIAM AUSTIN SHAW ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less