This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 18:21:46 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0592

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

BIANCA MUNIZ

Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM SHAW

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

02/02/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/02/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY WILLIAM SHAW ESQ

02/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY WILLIAM SHAW ESQ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GEICO CASUALTY CO 2/13/23

02/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GEICO CASUALTY CO 2/13/23

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GEICO CASUALTY CO 2/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY WILLIAM SHAW ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less