This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/11/2023 at 00:04:53 (UTC).

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC -VS- GARRISON PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSU

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 BANG AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARRISON PROPERTY CASUALTY INSU. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0928

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANG AUTOGLASS LLC

ENDEZHA PARKER

Defendant

GARRISON PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorneys

LEE TOBIN

WILLIAM KEBLER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-24 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 2/25/23

02/28/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 2/25/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GARRISON PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 3/13/23

03/17/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GARRISON PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 3/13/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LEE TOBIN ESQ & WILLIAM A KEBLER ESQ OBO DEFT

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LEE TOBIN ESQ & WILLIAM A KEBLER ESQ OBO DEFT

OPEN COURT MINUTES

04/05/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

RESPONSE & OBJECTION TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION OF CORP REP OF DEFT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

04/03/2023: RESPONSE & OBJECTION TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION OF CORP REP OF DEFT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

04/03/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

MOTION TO STAY PENDING RULING ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS STRIKE & FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

04/03/2023: MOTION TO STAY PENDING RULING ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS STRIKE & FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM & MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY DEFT

04/03/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM & MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY DEFT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/05/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE & OBJECTION TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION OF CORP REP OF DEFT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY PENDING RULING ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS STRIKE & FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF CMPL STATEMENT OF CLAIM & MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LEE TOBIN ESQ & WILLIAM A KEBLER ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GARRISON PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 3/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 2/25/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 04/05/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less