This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 18:30:09 (UTC).

ANDREW ZELMAN -VS- ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 ANDREW ZELMAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREW ZELMAN

ELLEN ZELMAN

Defendants

ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN JOHNSON

Defendant Attorney

DOUGLAS LAPOINTE

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/21/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY STEVE M JOHNSON OBO PLTFS

01/21/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY STEVE M JOHNSON OBO PLTFS

SUMMONS ISSUED - ST JOHNS INS CO

2022-01-21 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - ST JOHNS INS CO

COMPLAINT FILED

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING ORDER OF LIQUIDATION INJUNCTION & AUTOMATICE STAY AS TO ST JOHNS INS CO INC (AMENDED)

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF FILING ORDER OF LIQUIDATION INJUNCTION & AUTOMATICE STAY AS TO ST JOHNS INS CO INC (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY BY DEFT

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY BY DEFT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

02/21/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ST JOHNS INS CO INC 2/17/22

02/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ST JOHNS INS CO INC 2/17/22

NOTICE OF MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY DEFT

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORDER OF LIQUIDATION INJUNCTION & AUTOMATICE STAY AS TO ST JOHNS INS CO INC (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECEIVERSHIP/AUTOMATIC STAY BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ST JOHNS INS CO INC 2/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY STEVE M JOHNSON OBO PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ST JOHNS INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLAS J LAPOINTE