This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 17:39:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK -VS- ROSA A CUROTTO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSA A CUROTTO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7273

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendants

ROSA A CUROTTO

ROSA CUROTTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT MODLIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/23/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

01/06/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/05/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

OPEN COURT MINUTES

01/04/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - ROSA A CUROTTO AKA ROSA CUROTTO

12/30/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - ROSA A CUROTTO AKA ROSA CUROTTO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 02/08/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 02/08/2022 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - ROSA A CUROTTO AKA ROSA CUROTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 01/04/2022 at 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric