This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 14:15:29 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK -VS- REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5171

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants

REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC

JERMAINE REYNOLDS

REDEEMING LIGHT CENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT MODLIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED JERMAINE REYNOLDS

2022-12-22 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED JERMAINE REYNOLDS

SUMMONS ISSUED REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC

2022-12-22 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

12/22/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

COMPLAINT FILED

12/22/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 12/27/22

12/27/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 12/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JERMAINE REYNOLDS 1/6/23

01/11/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JERMAINE REYNOLDS 1/6/23

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC AKA REDEEMING LIGHT CENT 2/9/23

02/20/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC AKA REDEEMING LIGHT CENT 2/9/23

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC AKA REDEEMING LIGHT CENT 2/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JERMAINE REYNOLDS 1/6/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 12/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JERMAINE REYNOLDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED REDEEMING LIGHT CENTER INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less