This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 14:30:48 (UTC).

AMARR CO -VS- INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS L

Case Summary

On 12/22/2009 AMARR CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS L. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4342

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMARR CO

AMARR GARAGE DOORS CO

Defendants

INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LTD LIABILITY CO

C/O: Philip A Brown Or Scott C Quinlan, 2617, Madeline Ave, Winter Pk Or: 5840 Red Bug Lk Rd

St 295, Winter Springs, FL 32708

PHILIP A BROWN

Winter Springs, FL 32708

IMS CONSTRUCTION

Garnishee

CNL BANK

450 S Orange Ave, # 400

Orlando, FL 32801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM LINDEMAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

12/22/2009: COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET INVESTMENT MGT SOLUTIONS LLC

12/22/2009: CIVIL COVER SHEET INVESTMENT MGT SOLUTIONS LLC

MAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON|MAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON

12/31/2009: MAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON|MAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS

01/11/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-PHILIP A BROWN

01/11/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-PHILIP A BROWN

CLERKS MINUTES PT KAB (NO HRG)

01/26/2010: CLERKS MINUTES PT KAB (NO HRG)

DEFAULT ENTERED - INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LTD LIABILITY CO & P A BROWN 1/26/10 R

01/28/2010: DEFAULT ENTERED - INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LTD LIABILITY CO & P A BROWN 1/26/10 R

VENUE/NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

03/08/2010: VENUE/NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT ALREADY ENTERED

03/08/2010: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT ALREADY ENTERED

WRIT OF GARN ISSUED/ CNL BANK MLD TO ATTY LEGAL SERVICES

07/14/2010: WRIT OF GARN ISSUED/ CNL BANK MLD TO ATTY LEGAL SERVICES

ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARN & CLAIM FOR STATUTORY FEE/ CNLBANK

07/20/2010: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARN & CLAIM FOR STATUTORY FEE/ CNLBANK

NOTICE TO DEFT RE:GARN/ INVESTMETN MANGEMENT SOLUTIONS & PHILIP A BROWN

07/21/2010: NOTICE TO DEFT RE:GARN/ INVESTMETN MANGEMENT SOLUTIONS & PHILIP A BROWN

WRIT OF GARN RETURNED SERVED/CNL BANK

07/22/2010: WRIT OF GARN RETURNED SERVED/CNL BANK

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT/ CNLBANK Instrument: 2010088973

07/29/2010: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT/ CNLBANK Instrument: 2010088973

REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT/ $100 ATTY FEE DEPOSIT TO GARNISHEE, CNLBANK

07/29/2010: REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT/ $100 ATTY FEE DEPOSIT TO GARNISHEE, CNLBANK

CHECK MAILED #436712 $100 TO CNL BANK

08/04/2010: CHECK MAILED #436712 $100 TO CNL BANK

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AND REQ TO PRODUCE 3/31/11 2PM PHILIP A BROWN

02/18/2011: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AND REQ TO PRODUCE 3/31/11 2PM PHILIP A BROWN

NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLTF'S INTERROG TO DEFT, PHILIP A BROWN

04/20/2011: NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLTF'S INTERROG TO DEFT, PHILIP A BROWN

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLTF'S INTERROG TO DEFT, PHILIP A BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AND REQ TO PRODUCE 3/31/11 2PM PHILIP A BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK MAILED #436712 $100 TO CNL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT/ $100 ATTY FEE DEPOSIT TO GARNISHEE, CNLBANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT/ CNLBANK Instrument: 2010088973

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARN RETURNED SERVED/CNL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFT RE:GARN/ INVESTMETN MANGEMENT SOLUTIONS & PHILIP A BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO WRIT OF GARN & CLAIM FOR STATUTORY FEE/ CNLBANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARN ISSUED/ CNL BANK MLD TO ATTY LEGAL SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT/ INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT & PHILIP A BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/ INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT ALREADY ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVENUE/NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED - INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LTD LIABILITY CO & P A BROWN 1/26/10 R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS MINUTES PT KAB (NO HRG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-PHILIP A BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON|MAILED TO ATTORNEY - JUDGE ERIKSSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET INVESTMENT MGT SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/26/2010 09:00 AM|Reason: PT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amarr Company Group Welfare Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where CNLBANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindeman, William M