Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/19/2021 at 03:25:39 (UTC).

ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC -VS- TIQUANA JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TIQUANA JOHNSON. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0594

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC

THE PRESERVE AT SPRING LAKE

Defendant

TIQUANA JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 06/14/2021

06/10/2021: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 06/14/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/18/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD 2/17/21 - TIQUANA JOHNSON

03/24/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD 2/17/21 - TIQUANA JOHNSON

MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT & TO CHALLENGE VERACITY OF CDC DECLARATION BY PLTF

05/11/2021: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT & TO CHALLENGE VERACITY OF CDC DECLARATION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF HEARING 5/27/21 9:45AM

05/13/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING 5/27/21 9:45AM

NOTICE OF FILING DISCLOSURE BY PLTF

05/18/2021: NOTICE OF FILING DISCLOSURE BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES NON JURY TRIAL

05/27/2021: OPEN COURT MINUTES NON JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT AND IDENTIFICATION LIST

05/27/2021: EXHIBIT AND IDENTIFICATION LIST

PLTF EXHIBIT 1 - RESIDENTIAL LEASE DTD 10/21/20

05/27/2021: PLTF EXHIBIT 1 - RESIDENTIAL LEASE DTD 10/21/20

PLTF EXHIBIT 2 - THREE DAY NOTICE FROM PLTF TO DEFT DTD 2/6/21

05/27/2021: PLTF EXHIBIT 2 - THREE DAY NOTICE FROM PLTF TO DEFT DTD 2/6/21

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TIQUANA JOHNSON - JUDGE DEKLEVA 5/27/21 Instrument: 2021072168

05/27/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TIQUANA JOHNSON - JUDGE DEKLEVA 5/27/21 Instrument: 2021072168

NOTICE OF FILING CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/23/2021: NOTICE OF FILING CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

MOTION TO ABATE EVICTION PROCEEDING & MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO PUT IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/23/2021: MOTION TO ABATE EVICTION PROCEEDING & MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO PUT IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/23/2021: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

COMPLAINT FILED

02/16/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TIQUANA JOHNSON

02/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TIQUANA JOHNSON

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TIQUANA JOHNSON - JUDGE DEKLEVA 5/27/21 Instrument: 2021072168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF EXHIBIT 2 - THREE DAY NOTICE FROM PLTF TO DEFT DTD 2/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLTF EXHIBIT 1 - RESIDENTIAL LEASE DTD 10/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT AND IDENTIFICATION LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DISCLOSURE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 5/27/21 9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE RENT & TO CHALLENGE VERACITY OF CDC DECLARATION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD 2/17/21 - TIQUANA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE EVICTION PROCEEDING & MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO PUT IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D TIQUANA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PRESERVE AT SPRING LAKE is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON