Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 04:18:26 (UTC).

ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC -VS- STEPHEN SWARTZ

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against STEPHEN SWARTZ. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0721

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALTAMONTE BANDERA LLC

THE PRESERVE AT SPRING LAKE

Defendant

STEPHEN SWARTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH TAORMINO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JOE TAORMINA OBO DEFT

03/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JOE TAORMINA OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF HEARING 4/15/21 11:30AM

04/01/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING 4/15/21 11:30AM

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 4/15/21 @ 11:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 4/15/21 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D STEPHEN SWARTZ PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CORRECT COPY OF DEFT ANSWER & DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO DEFT ANSWER & DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JOE TAORMINA OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D STEPHEN SWARTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PRESERVE AT SPRING LAKE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taormina, Joseph Vincent