Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:38:46 (UTC).

ADVENIR AT MAGNOLIA LLC -VS- STIQUALLA STEWART

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 ADVENIR AT MAGNOLIA LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against STIQUALLA STEWART. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0729

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVENIR AT MAGNOLIA APARTMENTS

ADVENIR AT MAGNOLIA LLC

Defendant

STIQUALLA STEWART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

03/10/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D STIQUALLA STEWART

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D STIQUALLA STEWART

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STIQUALLA STEWART 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D STIQUALLA STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENIR AT MAGNOLIA APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON