This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/28/2022 at 20:16:23 (UTC).

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP -VS- PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3220

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

DINA SARKISIAN

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS WENZEL

VALERIE ZEPPILLI

Defendant Attorney

SAIDA WURIE

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/26/22

07/26/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/26/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

07/26/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/26/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

09/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

09/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

OPEN COURT MINUTES

09/07/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL & EMAIL BY VALERIE ZEPPILLI ESQ OBO PLTF

09/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL & EMAIL BY VALERIE ZEPPILLI ESQ OBO PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORP 8/9/22

09/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORP 8/9/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

09/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 09/07/2022 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL & EMAIL BY VALERIE ZEPPILLI ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORP 8/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY SAIDA B WURIE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 7/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 09/07/2022 AT 1000AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wurie, Saida, ESQ