This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 22:10:18 (UTC).

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT -VS- LORI KIDD

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORI KIDD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1726

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

LORI KIDD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH AFRICANO

RICHARD WEISSMAN

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/24/22

05/24/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/24/22

SUMMONS ISSUED LORI KIDD

05/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED LORI KIDD

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

05/24/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT FILED

05/24/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - LORI KIDD ON 6/2/22

06/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - LORI KIDD ON 6/2/22

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

06/14/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY RICHARD WEISSMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

06/23/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY RICHARD WEISSMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT-JUDGE KRAUSE-7/6/22

07/06/2022: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT-JUDGE KRAUSE-7/6/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT-JUDGE KRAUSE-7/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY RICHARD WEISSMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - LORI KIDD ON 6/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED LORI KIDD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ