Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 17:13:35 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS -VS- KOURTNEY COLEMAN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOURTNEY COLEMAN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1734

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

KOURTNEY COLEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE HINES

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN BERNHARDT

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/01/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KOURTNEY COLEMAN 3/8/21

03/08/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KOURTNEY COLEMAN 3/8/21

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

03/02/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2021-03-01 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/25/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL & SEEK ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS OBO DEFT -STEPHEN BERNHARDT ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KOURTNEY COLEMAN 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 05/25/2021 at 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant