Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/03/2021 at 03:58:31 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC -VS- VERONICA CHANDLER

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VERONICA CHANDLER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0359

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendant

VERONICA CHANDLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT SIVERSON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/01/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD - VERONICA CHANDLER 1/30/21

03/03/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD - VERONICA CHANDLER 1/30/21

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D VERONICA CHANDLER

01/27/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D VERONICA CHANDLER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SCOTT E SIVERSON ESQ OBO DEFT

02/05/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SCOTT E SIVERSON ESQ OBO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

02/05/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE /DECLARATION FOR CDC HALT IN EVICTIONS BY DEFT

02/05/2021: NOTICE /DECLARATION FOR CDC HALT IN EVICTIONS BY DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

01/27/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

ANSWER BY DEFT

02/05/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - PSTD - VERONICA CHANDLER 1/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE /DECLARATION FOR CDC HALT IN EVICTIONS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE SCOTT E SIVERSON ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D VERONICA CHANDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIVERSON, SCOTT