Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 02:23:49 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC -VS- SHEDRICK HARRIS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SHEDRICK HARRIS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0427

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendant

SHEDRICK HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SHEDRICK HARRIS

02/02/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SHEDRICK HARRIS

COMPLAINT FILED

02/02/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - FJ - UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO SHEDRICK HARRIS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/9/21 Instrument: 2021032279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - SHEDRICK HARRIS ON 2/5/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST SHEDRICK HARRIS 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D SHEDRICK HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON