Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:46:44 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC -VS- KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0733

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendants

KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA

FRANCIS BOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

ANSWER BY DEFT FRANCIS BOSE

03/05/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT FRANCIS BOSE

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA & FRANCIS BOSE

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA & FRANCIS BOSE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D KIMBERLY RAMIREZ-PARRA PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D FRANCIS BOSE PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT FRANCIS BOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D KIMBERLY RAMIREZ PARRA & FRANCIS BOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON