Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/02/2021 at 03:25:32 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC -VS- JAMES DAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JAMES DAVIS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0424

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendants

JAMES DAVIS JR

JAMES DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED

02/02/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES DAVIS & JAMES DAVIS JR

02/02/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES DAVIS & JAMES DAVIS JR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAMES DAVIS 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JAMES DAVIS JR 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RATIFYING STIP - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/12/21 Instrument: 2021032945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES DAVIS & JAMES DAVIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON