Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:52:55 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC -VS- HASSANE DOUDACH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HASSANE DOUDACH. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0735

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendant

HASSANE DOUDACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D HASSANE DOUDACH

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D HASSANE DOUDACH

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D HASSANE DOUDACH PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D HASSANE DOUDACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON