Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:14:47 (UTC).

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LC -VS- SALLY HUBE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SALLY HUBE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0734

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

675 JAMESTOWN BOULEVARD LC

TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS

Defendant

SALLY HUBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D SALLY HUBE PSTD 3/2/21

04/01/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D SALLY HUBE PSTD 3/2/21

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SALLY HUBE

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D SALLY HUBE

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION & DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D SALLY HUBE PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D SALLY HUBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON