This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 16:41:42 (UTC).

YUMIACO, AGNES SICAT, YUMIACO, GARY SICAT Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 YUMIACO, AGNES SICAT, YUMIACO, GARY SICAT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YUMIACO, AGNES SICAT

Decedent

YUMIACO, ORLANDO SANCHEZ SR

Not Classified By Court

YUMIACO, NOEL

YUMIACO, GARY SICAT

YUMIACO, ORLANDO SICAT JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER - ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES - CERTIFIED COPY OF OSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $4.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020018903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $4.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER - 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) - ORLANDO SANCHEZ YUMIACO SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION GREATER THAN $1,000 - INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $345.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020018719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $345.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CP000189CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON JR