This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/14/2022 at 14:07:28 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS MATLOCK, ALEXUS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MATLOCK, ALEXUS. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendant

MATLOCK, ALEXUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/19/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALEXUS MATLOCK 9-20-22

09/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALEXUS MATLOCK 9-20-22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

09/21/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

COMPLAINT

09/16/2022:COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

09/30/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/30/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALEXUS MATLOCK 9-20-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ALEXUS MATLOCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $195.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022032816

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS ADDRESSES, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001799CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M