This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/14/2022 at 14:07:20 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS LUMBERG, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUMBERG, THOMAS. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendant

LUMBERG, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/19/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THOMAS LUMBERG 9-20-22

09/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THOMAS LUMBERG 9-20-22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

09/21/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

09/23/2022:INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

COMPLAINT

09/16/2022:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION AND LETTER SENT TO SRSO WITH $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK WITH SRSO FEE - $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK REGARDING WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $195.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022032818

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS ADDRESSES, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001800CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC is a litigant