This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 14:24:46 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS JORDAN, AMANDA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JORDAN, AMANDA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendant

JORDAN, AMANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORRESPONDENCE

11/18/2022:CORRESPONDENCE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/18/2022:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING proposed

11/18/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/18/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA JORDAN

11/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA JORDAN

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

11/21/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMANDA JORDAN 11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMANDA JORDAN 11-22-22

RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/29/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMANDA JORDAN 11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA JORDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING proposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $195.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022040556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC002201CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less