This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 11/24/2022 at 14:20:20 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS JOHNSON, IRILYNN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, IRILYNN. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendants

WAITMAN, KEITH

JOHNSON, IRILYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING RENT

11/21/2022:ORDER DETERMINING RENT

NOTICE OF FILING TENANTS PAYMENT LEDGER

11/15/2022:NOTICE OF FILING TENANTS PAYMENT LEDGER

NOTICE SETTING VIDEO CONFERENCE ZOOM DETEMINE RENT HEARING

11/09/2022:NOTICE SETTING VIDEO CONFERENCE ZOOM DETEMINE RENT HEARING

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY (FORM 2.602) KEITH WAITMAN

11/02/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY (FORM 2.602) KEITH WAITMAN

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT KEITH WAITMAN

11/02/2022:ANSWER TO COMPLAINT KEITH WAITMAN

CHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

11/02/2022:CHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO IRILYNN JOHNSON

10/27/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO IRILYNN JOHNSON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KEITH WAITMAN

10/27/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KEITH WAITMAN

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED KEITH WAITMAN

10/26/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED KEITH WAITMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED IRILYNN JOHNSON

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED IRILYNN JOHNSON

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/25/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/25/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/25/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/25/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS ADDRESSES, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN.

10/25/2022:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS ADDRESSES, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN.

CORRESPONDENCE

10/25/2022:CORRESPONDENCE

COMPLAINT

10/25/2022:COMPLAINT

RECEIPT

11/02/2022:RECEIPT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING TENANTS PAYMENT LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING VIDEO CONFERENCE ZOOM DETEMINE RENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY (FORM 2.602) KEITH WAITMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT KEITH WAITMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $3,159.08 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022038260

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $3,159.08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS ADDRESSES, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $205.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022037210

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC002048CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less