This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 14:24:10 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS HOUGH, MARI

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOUGH, MARI. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendant

HOUGH, MARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORRESPONDENCE

11/18/2022:CORRESPONDENCE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/18/2022:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

11/18/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/18/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED MARI HOUGH

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED MARI HOUGH

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARI HOUGH 11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARI HOUGH 11-22-22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

11/29/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

11/30/2022:INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

ANSWER OF MARI HOUGH

11/30/2022:ANSWER OF MARI HOUGH

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MARI HOUGH

11/30/2022:ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MARI HOUGH

FAX COPY OF UPDATE ON MOVING FROM MARI HOUGH

12/05/2022:FAX COPY OF UPDATE ON MOVING FROM MARI HOUGH

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFAX COPY OF UPDATE ON MOVING FROM MARI HOUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT MARI HOUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF MARI HOUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARI HOUGH 11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MARI HOUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $195.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022040575

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC002204CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less