This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/20/2022 at 14:07:48 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS HOLMES, MY'ASIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOLMES, MY'ASIA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendants

HOLMES, MY'ASIA

PAYNE, MARCUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/21/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

COMPLAINT

09/20/2022:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MY'ASIA HOLMES VIA SUBSTITUTE 09/21/22

09/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MY'ASIA HOLMES VIA SUBSTITUTE 09/21/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARCUS PAYNE 09/21/22

09/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARCUS PAYNE 09/21/22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

09/28/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

09/30/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS LETTER TO SRSO AND CHECK FOR WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION SRSO FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PAYMENT LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARCUS PAYNE 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $205.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022033064

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001817CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M