This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/19/2022 at 14:27:33 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS HENLEY, DAKOTA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENLEY, DAKOTA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendants

HENLEY, KAMERON

HENLEY, DAKOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/19/2022:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KAMERON HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

09/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KAMERON HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DAKOTA HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

09/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DAKOTA HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

09/28/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

09/29/2022:INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

10/03/2022:INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

10/03/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DETEMINE RENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DAKOTA HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KAMERON HENLEY VIA POSTING 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY KAMERON HENLEY WITH PHOTOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING DAKOTA HENLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001804CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M