This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/27/2022 at 14:10:29 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS HALL, ANTONIO Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HALL, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendants

KING, ANGELA

HALL, ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/29/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANGELA KING

10/04/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANGELA KING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANTONIO HALL

10/04/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANTONIO HALL

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

10/04/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

COMPLAINT

09/28/2022:COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER STREAMLINED

10/11/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER STREAMLINED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO CLERK REGARDING WRIT OF POSSESSION AND SERVICE FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANTONIO HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $205.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022033917

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001891CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less