This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 14:24:28 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS CUNNINGHAM, ELIZABETH Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CUNNINGHAM, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendants

NEAL, JOANN

CUNNINGHAM, ELIZABETH

CUNNINGHAM, TERRY

Not Classified By Court

NEAL, JOAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/05/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

12/02/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

11/29/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOANN NEAL11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOANN NEAL11-22-22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TERRY CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TERRY CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOANN NEAL

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOANN NEAL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TERRY CUNNINGHAM

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TERRY CUNNINGHAM

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

11/22/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED TERRY CUNNINGHAM

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TERRY CUNNINGHAM

SUMMONS ISSUED JOANN NEAL a/k/a JOAN NEAL

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED JOANN NEAL a/k/a JOAN NEAL

SUMMONS ISSUED ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/18/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

11/18/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOANN NEAL11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TERRY CUNNINGHAM 11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOANN NEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING ELIZABETH CUNNINGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING TERRY CUNNINGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $215.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC002203CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less