This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 14:23:51 (UTC).

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC VS COTTRELL, TABITHA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COTTRELL, TABITHA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WL BLACKWATER 1 LLC

Defendant

COTTRELL, TABITHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORRESPONDENCE

11/18/2022:CORRESPONDENCE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/18/2022:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/18/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

11/18/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/18/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TABITHA COTTRELL

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TABITHA COTTRELL

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

11/22/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/23/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TABITHA COTTRELL11-22-22

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TABITHA COTTRELL11-22-22

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

11/29/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

12/02/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/05/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TABITHA COTTRELL11-22-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TABITHA COTTRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $195.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022040577

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC002205CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less