This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 13:57:52 (UTC).

WHISPER CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC VS BIEL REO, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 WHISPER CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC filed an Other lawsuit against BIEL REO, LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHISPER CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

Defendants

BIEL REO, LLC

IKERMAN, SHANE H.

WHISPER CREEK DEVELOPERS, INC.

D.R. HORTON, INC.

PORTER, CHRISTOPHER W.

POULOS, TOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMMANUEL, ROBERT ANTHONY

Defendant Attorneys

BAUMAN, KYLE STEVEN

BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD

MCINNIS, CARLTON JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL PENDING CLAIMS

05/16/2017:DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL PENDING CLAIMS

ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

11/14/2016:ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL HEARING

11/14/2016:PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

11/08/2016:CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/07/2016:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF TODD STAFFORD AS PRESIDENT OF WHISPER CREEK DEVELOPERS INC-

08/17/2016:AFFIDAVIT OF TODD STAFFORD AS PRESIDENT OF WHISPER CREEK DEVELOPERS INC-

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT

06/06/2016:PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT

RECEIPT

12/18/2015:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

12/18/2015:RECEIPT

AMENDED COMPLAINT 2ND

11/30/2015:AMENDED COMPLAINT 2ND

ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/18/2015:ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

07/06/2015:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL PENDING CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • NOTICE REPORT OF MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ORDER ON BIEL REO LLC'S MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DEFENDANT BIEL REO LLC'S MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION JOHN CROWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2015029242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • PAY FINE OR FILING WITH A DUE DATE 8/5/2015 UPDATED WITH COMPLIANCE ACTION OF SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $420.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • PAY FINE OR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • CASE 572015CA000556CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/6/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMMANUEL ROBERT A