This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 17:01:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO VS COBLE, RUSSELL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COBLE, RUSSELL. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

COBLE, RUSSELL

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

WALLACE, DANNY R

WALLACE, PATRICIA A

Not Classified By Court

WALLACE, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTILLO, TARA NATASHA

Defendant Attorneys

YORK, LISA K.

FIELD, SHANNAN MARIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/08/2017:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RECEIPT

05/24/2017:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

05/22/2017:RECEIPT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION PG

05/18/2017:PROOF OF PUBLICATION PG

FINAL JUDGMENT 344,271.78

01/31/2017:FINAL JUDGMENT 344,271.78

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

07/20/2016:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

06/27/2016:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED SUB ON RUSSELL A COBLE

05/26/2016:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED SUB ON RUSSELL A COBLE

COMPLAINT

11/13/2015:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESION (EMAILED TO ATTORNEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • REOPENED FOR REOPEN OTHER CIVIL ON 7/8/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,967.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2015049750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • PAY FINE OR FILING WITH A DUE DATE 12/13/2015 UPDATED WITH COMPLIANCE ACTION OF SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,967.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • CASE 572015CA000954CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • Reopen Date: 07/08/2017; Reopen Close Date: 07/12/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Reopen Date: 03/20/2017; Reopen Close Date: 03/21/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Reopen Date: 02/21/2017; Reopen Close Date: 02/22/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YORK, LISA K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELD SHANNAN