This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 12/09/2019 at 14:22:03 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASS VS DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GRE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GRE. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASS

Defendants

HOYT, RANDY J

HOYT, BONNI A

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BONNI HOYT 12-2-19

12/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BONNI HOYT 12-2-19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RANDY HOYT 12-2-19

12/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RANDY HOYT 12-2-19

AFFIDAVIT DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING 1/21/19

11/26/2019:AFFIDAVIT DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING 1/21/19

COMPLAINT

11/15/2019:COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE

11/15/2019:CERTIFICATE

SUMMONS ISSUED RANDY J. HOYT EMAILED EMAILED

11/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RANDY J. HOYT EMAILED EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DITECH FINANCIAL LLC. EMAILED TO ATTY

11/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DITECH FINANCIAL LLC. EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED BONNI A. HOYT EMAILED TO ATTY

11/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BONNI A. HOYT EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

11/15/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BONNI HOYT 12-2-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RANDY HOYT 12-2-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DITECH FINANCIAL LLC F/K/A GREEN TREE SERVICING 1/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RANDY J. HOYT EMAILED EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DITECH FINANCIAL LLC. EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BONNI A. HOYT EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $430.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051349

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $430.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000850CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less