This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/06/2019 at 09:42:27 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

ROBERTSON, CHRISSY M

NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

ROBERTSON, DAVID M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

01/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

01/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

01/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

01/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

01/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID ROBERTSON EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID ROBERTSON EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISSY ROBERTSON EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISSY ROBERTSON EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCAITION INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCAITION INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNONWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNONWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

03/19/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF RETURNED SUSPENDED MONEY SHORTAGE WITH CHECK FOR RECORDING TRANSACTION #808621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF SUSPENDED TRANSACTION RECEIPT FOR RECORDING OF DOCUMENT-RETURNED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED NONSERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION TWO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED NONSERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION ONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED NORTH HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 1-14-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED CHRISSY ROBERTSON 1-14-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED DAVID ROBERTSON 1-14-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019000730

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000006CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/4/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN, BARRY STUART