This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 11:01:46 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS CITIFINANCIAL SERVICING LLC SU Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITIFINANCIAL SERVICING LLC SU. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN PARTI

CITIFINANCIAL SERVICING LLC SU

ELIZABETH A MELVIN, UNKNOWN SP

MELVIN, ELIZABETH A

FIRST HORIZON FINANCIAL CORP.

IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

CONCILIO, AMY LORRAINE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELZABETH MELVIN

03/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELZABETH MELVIN

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON ELIZABETH MELVIN ON 03/14/2020

03/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON ELIZABETH MELVIN ON 03/14/2020

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

02/17/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #211/25/19

12/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #211/25/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CITIFINANCIAL SERVICING LLC 11/15/19

12/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CITIFINANCIAL SERVICING LLC 11/15/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FIRST HOUSING FINANCIAL CORP. 11/27/19

12/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FIRST HOUSING FINANCIAL CORP. 11/27/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABRTH A MELVIN

12/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABRTH A MELVIN

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH A MELVIN 11/23/19

12/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH A MELVIN 11/23/19

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION#2 EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION#2 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY 1 (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY 1 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH MELVIN (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH MELVIN (EMAILED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

LIS PENDENS

11/11/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELZABETH MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALIAS SUMMONS ON ELIZABETH MELVIN ON 03/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) ELIZABETH A MELVIN AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH A MELVIN N/KJA FRANK MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH A. MELVIN EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ELIZABETH A MELVIN EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $20.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020007525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $20.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO ELIZABETH MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $462.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000840CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less